IN SB0381 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Cigarette and tobacco taxes. Changes the stamp discount for cigarette distributors from $0.012 to $0.013. Changes the tax collection allowance for tobacco distributors from $0.006 to $0.007 for tobacco products other than cigarettes.~ Repeals the tax that applies to cigarette papers, wrappers, and tubes. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cigarette and tobacco taxes. Changes the stamp discount for cigarette distributors from $0.012 to $0.013. Changes the tax collection allowance for tobacco distributors from $0.006 to $0.007 for tobacco products other than cigarettes.~ Repeals the tax that applies to cigarette papers, wrappers, and tubes. Makes conforming changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 191
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 351: yeas 48, nays 2
2016-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2016-03-03SenateMotion to concur filed
2016-03-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 336: yeas 91, nays 0
2016-03-02HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-29HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-01SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2016-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Brown, T.
2016-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 49, nays 1
2016-01-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-26SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2016-01-26SenateSenator Walker added as third author
2016-01-26SenateSenator Kenley added as second author
2016-01-26SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Mishler

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/381/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/a/f/3daf5d40/SB0381.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/0/6/4f06914a/SB0381.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/a/7/cba7fe68/SB0381.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/0/e/d80ec86b/SB0381.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/a/0/bfa0314d/SB0381.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/9/e/639e4220/SB0381.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/2/2/722251cb/SB0381.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/b/4/bbb4a6d0/SB0381.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/c/c/48ccef26/SB0381.120.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/d/2/7ed22fbd/SB0381.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/3/1/3c31d764/SB0381.336.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/2/8/4a284bc7/SB0381.351.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback