IN SB0373 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 226
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Academic credits for religious instruction. Provides that a public secondary school student may receive not more than two elective academic credits for released time religious instruction classes if certain conditions are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Academic credits for religious instruction. Provides that a public secondary school student may receive not more than two elective academic credits for released time religious instruction classes if certain conditions are met.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 60 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 226
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-11SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 413: yeas 40, nays 8
2019-04-03SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 397: yeas 67, nays 26
2019-03-28HouseRepresentative Stutzman added as cosponsor
2019-03-28HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) ruled out of order
2019-03-28HouseAmendment #2 (Hamilton) ruled out of order
2019-03-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-27SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-26SenateCosponsors: Representatives Jordan and Bartlett
2019-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wesco
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 40, nays 8
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-24SenateSenator Raatz added as second author
2019-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Kruse

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/373/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/b/c/40bc9463/SB0373.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/b/5/d6b5a4cf/SB0373.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/2/5/d625e27c/SB0373.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/7/8/8d780000/SB0373.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/e/e/bfeed1d3/SB0373.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/0/3/6803c261/SB0373.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/1/4/d71445b1/SB0373.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/f/5/8cf5f158/SB0373.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/5/0/2d50ff97/SB0373.231.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/5/a/1c5a38bf/SB0373.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/a/1/67a1f22b/SB0373.365.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/b/e/40beb852/SB0373.397.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/d/6/b3d6f8ae/SB0373.413.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback