IN SB0371 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Probate matters. Provides that an individual otherwise qualified for certain property tax deductions for property that the individual occupies as a beneficiary of the trust that owns the property is not required to be considered the owner of the property under the rules of construction for the property tax law for the trust to receive the property tax deduction. Transfers certain inheritance tax duties from the probate court, county assessor, and county treasurer to the department of state revenue with respect to inheritance tax returns filed after March 31, 2016. Revises the inheritance tax allocation statute so that the current
Title
Probate matters. Provides that an individual otherwise qualified for certain property tax deductions for property that the individual occupies as a beneficiary of the trust that owns the property is not required to be considered the owner of the property under the rules of construction for the property tax law for the trust to receive the property tax deduction. Transfers certain inheritance tax duties from the probate court, county assessor, and county treasurer to the department of state revenue with respect to inheritance tax returns filed after March 31, 2016. Revises the inheritance tax allocation statute so that the current
Sponsors
Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Richard Hamm [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 190 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2016-02-22 | House | Representative Hamm added as cosponsor |
2016-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as second author |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Koch |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |