IN SB0369 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 248
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 248
2013-05-11SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-05-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-27SenateJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2013-04-26HouseJoint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2013-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 477: yeas 48, nays 0
2013-04-11SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-04-10HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-10HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 453: yeas 94, nays 0
2013-04-08HouseRepresentatives Moseley and DeLaney added as cosponsors
2013-04-04HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-02HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2013-02-11SenateCosponsor: Rep. Mahan
2013-02-11SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Frye
2013-02-11SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 95: yeas 47 and nays 1
2013-02-07SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-05SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-29SenateSenator Arnold added as second author
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Wyss

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback