IN SB0368 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act. Enacts the Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act, drafted by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws. Vests fiduciaries with the authority to access, control, or copy digital assets. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act. Enacts the Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act, drafted by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws. Vests fiduciaries with the authority to access, control, or copy digital assets. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-03SenateRepresentative Speedy added as sponsor
2015-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 49, nays 0
2015-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-01-22SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-22SenateSenator Young, M. added as third author
2015-01-22SenateSenator Bray added as second author
2015-01-22SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2015-01-12SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-12SenateAuthored by Senator Waltz

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback