IN SB0366 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Physician assistants. Allows advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants to issue written orders for home health services to a home health agency. Eliminates the requirements that a collaborative agreement between a collaborating physician and a physician assistant: (1) include all the tasks delegated to the physician assistant by the collaborating physician (instead requiring that the collaborative agreement include any limitations); and (2) specify the protocol to be followed by the physician assistant in prescribing a drug. Sets forth requirements of a collaborative agreement. Provides, as an exception to the requirement that a physician assistant may practice only subject to a collaboration agreement with a collaborating physician, that if a physician assistant practices in a licensed health care facility that has a credentialing process: (1) the physician assistant shall collaborate with and refer patients to appropriate members of the licensed health care facility's health care team; and (2) the responsibilities of the physician assistant and the degree of collaboration between the physician assistant and other members of the licensed health care facility's health care team shall be determined exclusively for purposes of the physician assistant's practice in the licensed health care facility by one or more persons in authority over the physician assistant. Provides that a physician assistant, without being delegated authority by a collaborating physician, may: (1) prescribe, dispense, administer, and procure drugs and medical devices; (2) plan and initiate a therapeutic regimen; and (3) prescribe and dispense schedule II-V substances and legend drugs. Allows a physician assistant to perform volunteer work regardless of the terms of or the existence of a collaboration agreement.
Title
Physician assistants.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Steven Davisson [R] | Rep. Ann Vermilion [R] | Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Vermilion A and Ziemke |
2021-02-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Davisson |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second author |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |