IN SB0366 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the judges of all the Marion County township small claims courts to select from among themselves a small claims administrative judge to carry out certain duties currently performed by the Marion circuit court judge, including adopting uniform rules for conducting the business of the small claims courts. Allows a vacationing small claims court judge instead of the Marion circuit court judge to authorize the appointment of a judge pro tempore to handle the judicial business of the small claims court. Makes changes to the maximum part of the aggregate disposable earnings of an individual for any workweek that is subjected to garnishment to enforce the payment of any judgments against the individual. If a judgment debtor has failed to comply with an agreed order in the action, requires a court to order: (1) any property, income, or profits of a judgment debtor not exempt from execution or process or any debt due to the judgment debtor to be applied to the satisfaction of the judgment and forbid transfers of property and choses in action; and (2) that the judgment or execution is a continuing lien upon the income or profits of the judgment debtor in the hands either of the judgment debtor or any other person from the date the order is served upon the person indebted to the judgment debtor to the extent that the lien, together with all similar liens, is allowed by law. Provides that: (1) if a court has issued a garnishment order to a third party (such as an employer) that provides income to a judgment debtor; (2) the garnishment order no longer applies to the third party due to a change in circumstances, including a change in employment; and (3) the judgment creditor files a petition describing the changed circumstances and providing contact
Title
Township small claims courts and garnishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 036601 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 036601 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Speedy added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Frizzell added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 186: yeas 38 and nays 10 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 366 Amendment #1 (Zakas), prevailed. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schneider, Young R Michael. |