IN SB0355 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various probate and trust matters. Provides that a trust may incorporate by reference a document that exists at the time the trust is executed. Specifies that funeral expenses and expenses of a tombstone are expenses of administration. Expands the definition of "person" in certain cases under the probate code to include governmental entities and other legal entities. Provides that a nonprobate transfer to a testamentary trust: (1) is valid upon the will being admitted to probate; and (2) is not subject to claims against the probate estate. Allows a governmental entity or business entity (in addition to an individual) to
Title
Various probate and trust matters. Provides that a trust may incorporate by reference a document that exists at the time the trust is executed. Specifies that funeral expenses and expenses of a tombstone are expenses of administration. Expands the definition of "person" in certain cases under the probate code to include governmental entities and other legal entities. Provides that a nonprobate transfer to a testamentary trust: (1) is valid upon the will being admitted to probate; and (2) is not subject to claims against the probate estate. Allows a governmental entity or business entity (in addition to an individual) to
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 81 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 474: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | Representative DeLaney added as cosponsor |
2015-04-07 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 376: yeas 94, nays 1 |
2015-04-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Representative Koch added as sponsor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 209: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as second author |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Steele |