IN SB0349 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study of taxes on short term rentals. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the following: (1) The issue of which entities are required to collect sales tax on short term rentals. (2) The issue of whether local units can impose a local innkeeper's tax on short term rentals. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of collecting and remitting state taxes in the peer-to-peer sharing economy.
Title
Study of taxes on short term rentals. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the following: (1) The issue of which entities are required to collect sales tax on short term rentals. (2) The issue of whether local units can impose a local innkeeper's tax on short term rentals. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of collecting and remitting state taxes in the peer-to-peer sharing economy.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 102 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 349: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Representative Lehman added as cosponsor |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 244: yeas 83, nays 12 |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Torr |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 43, nays 5 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tallian |