IN SB0348 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Public Law 211
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Regulation of signs. Provides that an ordinance or a regulation of a political subdivision relating to the number or size of signs is unenforceable beginning 60 days before an election and ending at the beginning of the sixth day after the election. Provides that for purposes of the statute, a "sign" refers to a sign, the surface area of which is not greater than 32 square feet. (Provides that the measurement of the surface area of a sign that has two faces is determined by measuring the surface area of only one of the faces if the faces are mounted

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation of signs. Provides that an ordinance or a regulation of a political subdivision relating to the number or size of signs is unenforceable beginning 60 days before an election and ending at the beginning of the sixth day after the election. Provides that for purposes of the statute, a "sign" refers to a sign, the surface area of which is not greater than 32 square feet. (Provides that the measurement of the surface area of a sign that has two faces is determined by measuring the surface area of only one of the faces if the faces are mounted

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenatePublic Law 211
2017-04-27SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-17SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-12SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 462: yeas 28, nays 11
2017-04-12SenateSenator Young M added as coauthor
2017-04-11SenateMotion to concur filed
2017-04-07HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2017-04-06HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 415: yeas 62, nays 33
2017-03-30HouseAmendment #1 (Speedy) motion withdrawn voice vote
2017-03-30HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2017-03-01SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-28SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2017-02-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Speedy
2017-02-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 45, nays 5
2017-02-27SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-26SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as second author
2017-01-24SenateSenator Sandlin J added as third author
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2017-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Freeman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/348/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/c/d/ebcd0bef/SB0348.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/b/7/6cb78dea/SB0348.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/f/2/baf24420/SB0348.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/0/3/7903a3aa/SB0348.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/5/6/6a5682d3/SB0348.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/c/c/20cc701c/SB0348.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/e/7/19e79bb4/SB0348.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/5/b/3e5be48e/SB0348.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/1/f/531f7700/SB0348.230.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/1/d/021de61f/SB0348.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/7/8/fe78abc9/SB0348.415.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/1/b/471b7aca/SB0348.462.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback