IN SB0340 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Private property matters. Requires a conveyance, a mortgage, or an instrument of writing to be recorded to be: (1) acknowledged by the grantor; and (2) proven before certain specified individuals; in certain instances. Requires the summons accompanying a complaint for condemnation to include language regarding the defendant's right to object to the condemnation within 30 days from the date notice is served. Requires a court to award reasonable costs and attorney's fees to a defendant whose objection to a complaint for condemnation is sustained. Caps the amount of attorney's fees a court may award if an objection to a condemnation is sustained at $25,000. Exempts a condemnation action brought by a public utility or by a pipeline company from the bill's provisions requiring a court to award a defendant in a condemnation action the defendant's reasonable costs and attorney's fees if the defendant's objections to the proceedings are sustained in the proceedings or upon appeal. Requires a municipality to provide notice by mail to affected owners, both residents and nonresidents of the municipality, of a condemnation. Permits an affected owner to file an objection that a municipality does not have the right to exercise the power of eminent domain for the use sought. Amends the time for a remonstrance hearing for a municipal condemnation and the defendant's right to judicial review of the decision made at the hearing to 30 days. (Current law requires a remonstrance hearing to be set no less than 10 days after notice and the defendant to appeal the decision within 20 days.) Provides parties the right to appeal a court's judgment in the judicial review of a municipal condemnation. Revises the statute allowing a municipality to condemn property for economic development to require a 3/4 affirmative vote of the municipality's legislative body to exercise the power of eminent domain. (Current law requires a 2/3 affirmative vote of the municipality's legislative body.) Allows a property owner to challenge a condemnation for economic development purposes by providing clear and convincing evidence that the owner's parcel is not necessary for the project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private property matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Shackleford) failed (Y: 28 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenatePublic Law 80
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 364: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 359: yeas 41, nays 7
2020-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Sherman, Manning, DeLaney and Pierce
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wolkins and Bauer
2020-03-03SenateSenate advisors appointed: Koch, Randolph Lonnie M, Buck and Mrvan
2020-03-03SenateSenate conferees appointed: Spartz and Taylor G
2020-03-03SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-03SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 62, nays 31
2020-02-27HouseRepresentative Manning added as cosponsor
2020-02-27HouseAmendment #1 (Shackleford) failed; Roll Call 230: yeas 28, nays 62
2020-02-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-28SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2020-01-28SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2020-01-28SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2020-01-28SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2020-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wolkins
2020-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 85: yeas 43, nays 7
2020-01-27SenateSenator Koch added as second author
2020-01-27SenateAmendment #1 (Spartz) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-13SenateAuthored by Senator Spartz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/340/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/5/e/9f5ea42d/SB0340.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/a/b/7/eab71a20/SB0340.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/d/4/fdd4ccb5/SB0340.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/3/2/043297bd/SB0340.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/3/8/5c388ffb/SB0340.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/a/7/4ba7a496/SB0340.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/f/8/e8f81753/SB0340.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/0/4/7f0428bb/SB0340.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/0/f/170fc6bf/SB0340.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/d/c/51dca6ea/SB0340.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/b/9/77b9d4a0/SB0340.85_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/0/e/a10ee610/SB0340.03.ENGS.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/a/7/e6a7f16d/SB0340.230_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/0/b/fe0b8455/SB0340.262_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/f/f/d0ff2cd4/SB0340.364_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/8/4/7284f068/SB0340.359_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback