IN SB0331 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 132
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education matters. Provides that, for purposes of determining the funding floor for teachers of a school corporation, the amount a school corporation expends for full-time teacher salaries shall include the amount the school corporation expends for participating in a special education cooperative or a career and technical education cooperative that is directly attributable to the salaries of full-time teachers employed by the cooperative, as determined by the department of education (department). Requires the department to annually report to the legislative council and the state budget committee on certain matters regarding full-time teacher salaries and benefits and the issuance of waivers of the requirement that a school corporation expend a specified percentage of tuition support for full-time teacher salaries. Authorizes the treasurer of state (treasurer) to deduct up to 10% of funds made available for the Indiana education scholarship account program (program) to cover costs of administering the program in the first year and up to 5% of funds made available in each year thereafter. Establishes the Indiana education scholarship account administration fund (fund) to support the administration of the program. Requires any amounts deducted by the treasurer for administration costs to be deposited in the fund. Removes a requirement for certain participating entities in the program to post a surety bond. Makes technical corrections.
Title
Education matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R] | Rep. Jake Teshka [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 132 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 387: yeas 92, nays 4 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 366: yeas 35, nays 15 |
2022-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as conferee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Raatz removed as advisor |
2022-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Goodrich, Cook and DeLaney |
2022-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Raatz and Melton |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Buchanan and Ford J.D. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 75, nays 22 |
2022-02-24 | House | Representatives Goodrich and Teshka J added as cosponsors |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 175: yeas 37, nays 12 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Crane added as third author |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buchanan |