IN SB0330 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Public Law 228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Annexation. Provides the following for annexations for which an annexation ordinance is adopted after June 30, 2015: (1) Remonstrance petitions are filed with the county auditor (instead of a court). (2) An annexation ordinance does not proceed if at least 65% of owners of nontax exempt land or the owners of 80% of the assessed value of nontax exempt land in the annexation territory sign a remonstrance. (3) Provides that an annexation may proceed to a hearing if a petition for remonstrance is signed by at least 51% of the owners of land (excluding tax-exempt land) or the owners of

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annexation. Provides the following for annexations for which an annexation ordinance is adopted after June 30, 2015: (1) Remonstrance petitions are filed with the county auditor (instead of a court). (2) An annexation ordinance does not proceed if at least 65% of owners of nontax exempt land or the owners of 80% of the assessed value of nontax exempt land in the annexation territory sign a remonstrance. (3) Provides that an annexation may proceed to a hearing if a petition for remonstrance is signed by at least 51% of the owners of land (excluding tax-exempt land) or the owners of

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Broden) failed (Y: 13 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-07SenatePublic Law 228
2015-05-07SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-05-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2015-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker
2015-04-29SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 576: yeas 43, nays 6
2015-04-29HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 597: yeas 87, nays 0
2015-04-20HouseHouse Advisors appointed: Mahan, Truitt, Sullivan, Aylesworth, Thompson, Riecken and Errington
2015-04-20HouseHouse Conferees appointed: Negele and Pryor
2015-04-20SenateSenate Advisors appointed: Head, Taylor, Buck and Alting
2015-04-20SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Boots and Broden
2015-04-20SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2015-04-16SenateMotion to dissent filed
2015-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2015-04-14HouseRepresentative Bartlett added as cosponsor
2015-04-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 439: yeas 73, nays 21
2015-04-13HouseAmendment #1 (Thompson) motion withdrawn voice vote
2015-04-13HouseAmendment #3 (Truitt) prevailed; voice vote
2015-04-13HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-04-07HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-03-05HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2015-02-25SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-24SenateRepresentative Truitt added as cosponsor
2015-02-24SenateRepresentative Negele added as sponsor
2015-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 34, nays 16
2015-02-23SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2015-02-23SenateAmendment #2 (Broden) failed; Roll Call 196: yeas 13, nays 37
2015-02-23SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-19SenateSenator Smith added as coauthor
2015-02-19SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-03SenateSenator Buck added as third author
2015-01-08SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2015-01-08SenateAuthored by Senators Boots and Head

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2015/bills/senate/330/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/1/3/ec13b3b3/SB0330.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/e/6/87e609d0/SB0330.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/6/2/1d62be5e/SB0330.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/b/1/e2b1ef95/SB0330.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/6/d/4c6d85b5/SB0330.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/9/b/8c9b43d3/SB0330.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/a/e/4eae438e/SB0330.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/b/2/13b24d68/SB0330.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/4/0/c4400c93/SB0330.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/5/b/535be4ee/SB0330.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/d/e/a5de7ee4/SB0330.196.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/f/0/c1f05d6e/SB0330.239.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/c/5/adc5c7af/SB0330.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/2/4/fe24d53c/SB0330.439.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/4/e/c64ed419/SB0330.597.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/9/4/5894364b/SB0330.576.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback