IN SB0330 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Permits the board of accountancy or the executive director of the licensing agency on behalf of the board to adopt an emergency rule that incorporates by reference the latest statement, edition, or compilation of nationally recognized professional standards governing the competent practice of accountancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certified public accountants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Signed by the Governor
2012-02-29 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-02-27 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-02-27 Signed by the Speaker
2012-02-20 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2012-02-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: yeas 95, nays 0
2012-02-16 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2012-01-31 Cosponsors: Reps. Austin, Ubelhor and Welch
2012-01-31 House sponsor: Rep. Heaton
2012-01-31 Referred to the House
2012-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 49 and nays 1
2012-01-30 Amendment 1 (Yoder), prevailed; voice vote
2012-01-30 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-01-20 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-19 Senator Broden added as second author
2012-01-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2012-01-09 Authored by Senator Yoder

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback