IN SB0324 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Credit card payments for charity gaming. Provides that a qualified organization may accept credit cards for the purchase of: (1) a chance to play any game of chance offered at an allowable activity; or (2) licensed supplies. Provides that certain credit card payments: (1) may be made on the Internet; and (2) may not exceed $1,500 in a single transaction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Credit card payments for charity gaming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseRepresentative Olthoff added as cosponsor
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Carbaugh
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 189: yeas 41, nays 6
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Busch) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-18SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-02-16SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2021-02-15SenateSenator Ford Jon added as second author
2021-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2021-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Busch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/324/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/a/3/f8a31d4f/SB0324.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/a/3/75a3405b/SB0324.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/f/5/eef59637/SB0324.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/4/f/f54f1a25/SB0324.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/a/1/fba157ea/SB0324.03.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/6/9/08695d0f/SB0324.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/5/f/0d5f3786/SB0324.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/3/d/643df294/SB0324.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/d/2/cbd212db/SB0324.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/1/6/5f16f382/SB0324.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/b/f/8abf6681/SB0324.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/9/f/939fd70d/SB0324.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/6/c/566cb299/SB0324.189_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback