IN SB0321 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local government budgeting. Provides that for each budget year after 2018, the department of local government finance (DLGF) shall certify a political subdivision's budget, tax rate, and tax levy not later than: (1) December 31 of the year preceding the budget year, unless a taxing unit in a county is issuing debt after December 1 in the year preceding the budget year or intends to file a shortfall appeal; or (2) January 15 of the budget year, if a taxing unit in a county is issuing debt after December 1 in the year preceding the budget year or intends to
Title
Local government budgeting. Provides that for each budget year after 2018, the department of local government finance (DLGF) shall certify a political subdivision's budget, tax rate, and tax levy not later than: (1) December 31 of the year preceding the budget year, unless a taxing unit in a county is issuing debt after December 1 in the year preceding the budget year or intends to file a shortfall appeal; or (2) January 15 of the budget year, if a taxing unit in a county is issuing debt after December 1 in the year preceding the budget year or intends to
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Miller [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] |
Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Rep. Milo Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 184 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 336: yeas 44, nays 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-01 | House | Representatives Klinker and Smith, M. added as cosponsors |
2016-03-01 | House | Representative Porter added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 307: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Amendment #1 (Harman) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Huston |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 106: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third author |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as second author |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Miller Pete |