IN SB0315 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
Pending: House Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Access to employee restrooms. Provides that if a retail establishment has a restroom facility on its premises for the use of the retail establishment's employees, a customer, upon request, must be allowed to use the restroom facility during normal business hours if certain conditions are met. Specifies that a customer who uses the retail establishment's employee restroom facility is responsible for leaving the restroom facility in the same condition as when the customer entered the restroom facility. Provides immunity from civil liability for any act or omission in allowing a customer to use an employee restroom facility if all of

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to employee restrooms. Provides that if a retail establishment has a restroom facility on its premises for the use of the retail establishment's employees, a customer, upon request, must be allowed to use the restroom facility during normal business hours if certain conditions are met. Specifies that a customer who uses the retail establishment's employee restroom facility is responsible for leaving the restroom facility in the same condition as when the customer entered the restroom facility. Provides immunity from civil liability for any act or omission in allowing a customer to use an employee restroom facility if all of

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2017-02-16SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-14SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2017-02-14SenateCosponsors: Representatives Kirchhofer and Austin
2017-02-14SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bacon
2017-02-14SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 32, nays 18
2017-02-13SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-13SenateSenator Mrvan added as coauthor
2017-02-13SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-13SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-07SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-02-06SenateSenator Alting added as coauthor
2017-01-17SenateSenator Crider added as second author
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2017-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Becker

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback