IN SB0309 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 264
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 264
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Distributed generation. Requires: (1) the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to post a summary of the results of the IURC's most recent periodic review of the basic rates and charges of an electricity supplier on the IURC's Internet web site; and (2) the electricity supplier subject to the review to provide a link on the electricity supplier's Internet web site to the IURC's posted summary. Amends the statute concerning alternate energy production, cogeneration, and small hydro facilities to: (1) include in the definition of a "private generation project" certain cogeneration facilities that: (A) are located on the same site as the
Title
Distributed generation. Requires: (1) the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to post a summary of the results of the IURC's most recent periodic review of the basic rates and charges of an electricity supplier on the IURC's Internet web site; and (2) the electricity supplier subject to the review to provide a link on the electricity supplier's Internet web site to the IURC's posted summary. Amends the statute concerning alternate energy production, cogeneration, and small hydro facilities to: (1) include in the definition of a "private generation project" certain cogeneration facilities that: (A) are located on the same site as the
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Stoops) failed (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #5 (Stoops) failed (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Public Law 264 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 442: yeas 37, nays 11 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 378: yeas 56, nays 43 |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Soliday |
2017-02-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ober |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 39, nays 9 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Stoops) failed; Roll Call 175: yeas 10, nays 36 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Lanane) failed; voice vote |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Stoops) failed; voice vote |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hershman |