IN SB0309 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 181
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State and local taxation. Eliminates the exemption for property taxes during the planning and construction of a residence that is conveyed upon completion to a low income individual by a nonprofit organization. Restricts but does not eliminate the exemption for property taxes for improvements on real property that are constructed, rehabilitated, or acquired for the purpose of providing low income housing. Specifies that the payments in lieu of taxes (PILOTS) that may be required from a property owner claiming such an exemption may not be imposed for an assessment date occurring after January 1, 2017. Eliminates the property tax deduction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and local taxation. Eliminates the exemption for property taxes during the planning and construction of a residence that is conveyed upon completion to a low income individual by a nonprofit organization. Restricts but does not eliminate the exemption for property taxes for improvements on real property that are constructed, rehabilitated, or acquired for the purpose of providing low income housing. Specifies that the payments in lieu of taxes (PILOTS) that may be required from a property owner claiming such an exemption may not be imposed for an assessment date occurring after January 1, 2017. Eliminates the property tax deduction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 181
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 450: yeas 70, nays 23
2016-03-10HouseRepresentative Sullivan added as conferee
2016-03-10HouseRepresentative Sullivan removed as advisor
2016-03-10HouseRepresentative Pryor removed as conferee
2016-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 415: yeas 49, nays 1
2016-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2016-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2016-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Huston, Thompson, Sullivan, Stemler and DeLaney
2016-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Brown T and Pryor
2016-03-04SenateSenate advisors appointed: Holdman, Broden and Eckerty
2016-03-04SenateSenate conferees appointed: Hershman and Mrvan
2016-03-04SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2016-03-04SenateMotion to dissent filed
2016-03-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2016-03-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 342: yeas 88, nays 4
2016-03-02HouseAmendment #10 (Culver) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-02HouseAmendment #7 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-02HouseAmendment #12 (Sullivan) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-02HouseAmendment #6 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-02HouseAmendment #9 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-29HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-15HouseRepresentative Thompson added as cosponsor
2016-02-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-03SenateCosponsor: Representative Huston
2016-02-03SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Brown, T.
2016-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 48, nays 1
2016-02-02SenateSenator Holdman added as second author
2016-02-02SenateAmendment #4 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2016-02-02SenateAmendment #3 (Broden) failed; voice vote
2016-02-02SenateAmendment #2 (Broden) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-02SenateAmendment #1 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote
2016-02-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/309/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/7/a/017ac467/SB0309.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/4/5/91454345/SB0309.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/2/c/342c1d13/SB0309.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/b/3/afb35fd4/SB0309.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/5/2/ae52df32/SB0309.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/2/d/5d2dda3e/SB0309.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/8/e/a08e79f1/SB0309.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/d/8/68d8bba8/SB0309.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/7/3/a9733f52/SB0309.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/0/3/cf03970e/SB0309.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/d/e/f5def97c/SB0309.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/8/9/4a893a00/SB0309.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/2/8/cc2897cf/SB0309.158.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/b/6/50b6ce12/SB0309.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/d/e/ebded240/SB0309.342.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/1/a/9/71a9f724/SB0309.415.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/1/6/f416c739/SB0309.450.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback