IN SB0309 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Public Law 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electricity suppliers' service areas. Provides that after May 19, 2015, a municipality that: (1) owns and operates an electric utility; and (2) annexes an area beyond the assigned service area of its municipally owned electric utility; may not petition the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to change the assigned service area of the municipally owned electric utility to include the annexed area according to certain procedures permitted under current law. Provides that the prohibition does not affect a petition that is: (1) filed with the IURC before May 20, 2015, according to the procedures permitted under current law; and (2) pending
Title
Electricity suppliers' service areas. Provides that after May 19, 2015, a municipality that: (1) owns and operates an electric utility; and (2) annexes an area beyond the assigned service area of its municipally owned electric utility; may not petition the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to change the assigned service area of the municipally owned electric utility to include the annexed area according to certain procedures permitted under current law. Provides that the prohibition does not affect a petition that is: (1) filed with the IURC before May 20, 2015, according to the procedures permitted under current law; and (2) pending
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Doug Eckerty [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] |
Sen. Carlin Yoder [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Robert Cherry [R] |
Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] | Rep. David Ober [R] | Rep. Linda Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Utilities - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Utilities - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Senate | Public Law 31 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 386: yeas 44, nays 3 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-03-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 338: yeas 70, nays 21 |
2015-03-26 | House | Amendment #1 (Negele) motion withdrawn |
2015-03-26 | House | Amendment #5 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Representative Lawson added as cosponsor |
2015-03-16 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-03-12 | House | Representative Ober added as cosponsor |
2015-03-10 | House | Representative Pryor added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Representative Cherry added as cosponsor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Representative Koch added as sponsor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Broden) failed; voice vote |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senators Ford and Yoder added as coauthors |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as third author |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second author |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |