IN SB0309 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Sections 3 through 6 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates the requirement that a school corporation begin budgeting on a school year basis in 2011. Permits a school corporation in any year to determine whether to budget on a calendar year or school year basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School corporation budget year.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-26 Sections 3 through 6 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-26 Sections 1 through 2 effective 03/25/2010
2010-03-26 Public Law 111
2010-03-25 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-19 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-16 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-10 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 319: Yeas 94, Nays 1
2010-03-05 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 281: Yeas 50, Nays 0
2010-03-04 Rules suspended
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2010-03-01 House advisors appointed: Goodin and Thompson
2010-03-01 House conferees appointed: Porter and Behning
2010-03-01 Senate advisors appointed: Kenley, Kruse and Sipes
2010-03-01 Senate conferees appointed: Alting and Broden
2010-03-01 Senate dissented from House amendments
2010-02-25 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-25 Amendment 15 ( Porter) and prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-25 Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted, passed; Roll Call 248: Yeas 83, Nays 16
2010-02-24 Amendment 4 (Thompson), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Amendment 7 (Behning), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Amendment 6 (Behning), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Amendment 14 (Goodin), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Amendment 11 (Bell), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Amendment 10 (Truitt), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Amendment 8 (Truitt), failed; Roll Call 218: Yeas 46, Nays 53
2010-02-24 Amendment 9 (Dermody), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Amendment 2 (Goodin), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-24 Amendment 13 (Clere), failed; Roll Call 217: Yeas 45, Nays 54
2010-02-24 Amendment 12 (Porter), prevailed; Roll Call 216: Yeas 57, Nays 42
2010-02-24 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-02-22 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Espich
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Porter
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 145: Yeas 36 and Nays 14
2010-02-01 Amendment 2 (Errington), failed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-26 Senator Zakas added as coauthor
2010-01-25 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-21 Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
2010-01-21 Senator Broden added as coauthor
2010-01-19 Senator Miller added as second author
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Alting

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback