IN SB0308 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Local tax matters. Provides that when calculating the base rate for agricultural land for the January 1, 2016, assessment date and each assessment date thereafter, the department of local government finance (DLGF) shall do the following: (1) Use the six most recent years preceding the year in which the assessment date occurs for which data is available (before the highest of those six years is eliminated when determining the rolling average). (2) After determining a preliminary base rate that would apply for the assessment date, adjust the preliminary base rate as follows: (A) If the preliminary base rate for the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local tax matters. Provides that when calculating the base rate for agricultural land for the January 1, 2016, assessment date and each assessment date thereafter, the department of local government finance (DLGF) shall do the following: (1) Use the six most recent years preceding the year in which the assessment date occurs for which data is available (before the highest of those six years is eliminated when determining the rolling average). (2) After determining a preliminary base rate that would apply for the assessment date, adjust the preliminary base rate as follows: (A) If the preliminary base rate for the

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Amendment #4 (Macer) prevailed (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 180
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 448: yeas 84, nays 12
2016-03-10SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 414: yeas 44, nays 6
2016-03-10HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2016-03-10SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2016-03-10SenateSenator Ford added as conferee
2016-03-10SenateSenator Mrvan removed as conferee
2016-03-03HouseHouse advisors appointed: Cherry, Karickhoff, Lehe, Macer, Porter and Moed
2016-03-03HouseHouse conferees appointed: Brown T and Pryor
2016-03-03SenateSenator Leising added as advisor
2016-03-03SenateSenate advisors appointed: Bassler, Broden and Perfect
2016-03-03SenateSenate conferees appointed: Hershman and Mrvan
2016-03-03SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2016-03-03SenateMotion to dissent filed
2016-03-02HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2016-03-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 330: yeas 92, nays 1
2016-03-01HouseAmendment #3 (Davisson) prevailed;
2016-03-01HouseAmendment #4 (Macer) prevailed; Roll Call 285: yeas 60, nays 34
2016-03-01HouseAmendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-01HouseAmendment #2 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
2016-03-01HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-15HouseRepresentative Thompson added as cosponsor
2016-02-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-01SenateCosponsors: Representatives Lehe and Cherry
2016-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Brown, T.
2016-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 105: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-01-28SenateAmendment #4 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-28SenateAmendment #3 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-25SenateSenator Tomes added as coauthor
2016-01-21SenateSenator Niemeyer added as coauthor
2016-01-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-19SenateSenators Houchin and Raatz added as coauthors
2016-01-11SenateSenator Perfect added as coauthor
2016-01-11SenateSenators Charbonneau and Leising added as coauthors
2016-01-11SenateSenator Bassler added as second author
2016-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/308/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/0/9/6709142e/SB0308.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/e/f/81ef5a28/SB0308.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/e/c/20ec9c25/SB0308.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/3/d/cb3da451/SB0308.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/f/c/4efcf61d/SB0308.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/a/1/d6a178f2/SB0308.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/d/3/68d32fab/SB0308.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/7/6/9d76f4ab/SB0308.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/6/b/b56b2376/SB0308.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/3/6/6836d0f3/SB0308.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/7/c/157c8ce5/SB0308.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/b/a/d0ba3c75/SB0308.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/b/4/2ab4421d/SB0308.105.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/7/f/0d7ffdd4/SB0308.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/7/1/e37185b9/SB0308.285.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/3/b/c33bf057/SB0308.330.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/1/e/d61eb274/SB0308.414.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/4/9/e8499c64/SB0308.448.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback