IN SB0308 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy
Pending: House Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy
Pending: House Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends references to federal telecommunications law made obsolete by amendments to the federal law. Repeals the statute that requires the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to determine, under certain circumstances, a successor local telephone exchange carrier for an area in which an exiting local exchange carrier ceases operations. Makes conforming amendments. For purposes of the statute that allows the IURC to declare an emergency in an area in Indiana in which voice service is not offered by a communications service provider, specifies that if the IURC authorizes a provider to offer voice service in the area, the IURC must permit the provider to offer the service through any available technology or medium determined by the provider. Provides that upon notice to the IURC by an incumbent local exchange carrier (ILEC) that is the provider of last resort (POLR) in one or more parts of the ILEC's service area, the ILEC is relieved of its obligation as the POLR in any part of the ILEC's service area in which there are at least two communications service providers (one of which may be the ILEC) offering certain voice telephony services specified in federal regulations. Provides that after June 30, 2014, upon notice to the IURC by an ILEC that is the POLR in one or more parts of the ILEC's service area, the ILEC is relieved of its POLR obligation with respect to any part of its service area identified in its notice. Specifies that relief from a POLR obligation does not affect an ILEC's obligations under federal law.
Title
Telecommunications providers of last resort.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities and Energy | |
2012-01-31 | Cosponsors: Reps. DeLaney, VanNatter and Stevenson | |
2012-01-31 | House sponsor: Rep. Lehman | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 43 and nays 7 | |
2012-01-30 | Senators Randolph and Taylor added as coauthors | |
2012-01-30 | Senator Holdman added as second author | |
2012-01-30 | Amendment 1 (R. Young), failed; voice vote | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities & Technology | |
2012-01-05 | Authored by Senator Hershman |