IN SB0307 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 03/18/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that in Floyd County: (1) the Floyd circuit court has exclusive jurisdiction over probate and trust matters; and (2) the Floyd circuit court and Floyd superior court No. 3 have concurrent juvenile jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Floyd County courts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 03/18/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 82
2010-03-18 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-16 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-11 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-09 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 269: Yeas 50, Nays 0
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 297: Yeas 96, Nays 0
2010-03-04 Rules suspended
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2010-02-25 House advisors appointed: Stemler, M. Smith and Clere
2010-02-25 House conferees appointed: Robertson and Koch
2010-02-25 Senate advisor appointed: Delph and Lewis
2010-02-25 Senate conferee appointed: Bray and Sipes
2010-02-25 Senate dissented from House amendments
2010-02-22 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: Yeas 96, Nays 0
2010-02-18 Representative Koch added as cosponsor
2010-02-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-16 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-02-02 Cosponsors: Reps. Stemler and Clere
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Robertson
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 144: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-01 Senator Delph added as coauthor
2010-02-01 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-26 Senator Bray added as second author
2010-01-12 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-12 Authored by Senator Sipes

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback