IN SB0306 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Harman added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Harman added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Makes a change to the requirement that qualifies a retail tobacco store or cigar specialty store to allow smoking on the premises to provide that the store may not sell food or beverages in a manner that requires consumption on the premises. (Current law provides that the store may not sell food or beverages for consumption on the premises.)
Title
Tobacco shop sale of food and beverages.
Sponsors
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. James Arnold [D] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Timothy Harman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 030601 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 030601 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Harman added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Policy |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative McNamara added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Bacon added sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 112: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report; do pass, adopted |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Public Policy |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Becker. |