IN SB0302 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State and local finance. Specifies the manner in which certain excise taxes and local taxes collected under the tax amnesty program shall be distributed. Provides that after making the distributions required under the tax amnesty program, the next $42,000,000 collected under the program must be deposited into the Indiana regional cities development fund. Provides that any remaining amounts collected under the tax amnesty program shall be deposited in the state bicentennial capital account (rather than the state general fund, under current law). Specifies that revenue received from the rental of certain communications system infrastructure shall be deposited in the state
Title
State and local finance. Specifies the manner in which certain excise taxes and local taxes collected under the tax amnesty program shall be distributed. Provides that after making the distributions required under the tax amnesty program, the next $42,000,000 collected under the program must be deposited into the Indiana regional cities development fund. Provides that any remaining amounts collected under the tax amnesty program shall be deposited in the state bicentennial capital account (rather than the state general fund, under current law). Specifies that revenue received from the rental of certain communications system infrastructure shall be deposited in the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative Klinker removed as cosponsor |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative Torr added as sponsor |
2016-02-16 | House | Representative Cherry removed as sponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, T., Porter, Klinker |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cherry |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 35, nays 15 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as third author |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2016-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley |