IN SB0300 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Residential tax increment financing. Removes the threshold conditions for establishing a residential housing development program and a tax increment allocation area for the program, including the condition that the governing body of each school corporation affected by the program pass a resolution approving the program before the program may go into effect. Provides that the fiscal body of a county may adopt an ordinance to designate an economic development target area.
Title
Residential tax increment financing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senators Doriot and Ford Jon added as coauthors |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as coauthor |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Heine and O'Brien T |
2023-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Miller D |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 28, nays 19 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as coauthor |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senator Baldwin added as coauthor |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as third author |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rogers |
Subjects
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT, Redevelopment and Renovation of Urban Areas
HOUSING
PROPERTY TAXES, Credits and Deductions
SCHOOLS generally (K-12)
HOUSING
PROPERTY TAXES, Credits and Deductions
SCHOOLS generally (K-12)