IN SB0296 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Representative Hale added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Representative Hale added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adult entertainment performers. Requires a holder of a retailer's permit that provides adult entertainment on the licensed premises to: (1) require adult entertainment performers to provide proof of age and proof of legal residency; (2) take a photograph of each adult entertainer who auditions to provide adult entertainment at the licensed premises and retain the photograph for at least three years; (3) require all employees to sign a document acknowledging their awareness of the problem of human trafficking; (4) display human trafficking awareness posters in at least two places in the licensed premises; and (5) cooperate with any law enforcement
Title
Adult entertainment performers. Requires a holder of a retailer's permit that provides adult entertainment on the licensed premises to: (1) require adult entertainment performers to provide proof of age and proof of legal residency; (2) take a photograph of each adult entertainer who auditions to provide adult entertainment at the licensed premises and retain the photograph for at least three years; (3) require all employees to sign a document acknowledging their awareness of the problem of human trafficking; (4) display human trafficking awareness posters in at least two places in the licensed premises; and (5) cooperate with any law enforcement
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] | Sen. Amanda Banks [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Rep. David Frizzell [R] |
Rep. Christina Hale [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce & Technology - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce & Technology - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Representative Hale added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Representative Frizzell added as sponsor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 208: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as third author |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senator Alting added as second author |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senator Banks A added as coauthor |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |