IN SB0296 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that an individual is eligible for a scholarship from a scholarship program that is certified by the department of education if the student received a scholarship in a preceding school year, including a school year that does not immediately precede a school year in which the individual receives a scholarship from a scholarship granting organization. Provides that an individual must be a member of a household with an annual income of not more than 200% of the amount required for the individual to qualify for the federal free or reduced price lunch program each year that an individual receives a scholarship from a scholarship granting organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certified scholarship program eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Amendment 1 (VanDenburgh), failed (Y: 36 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-14 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-13 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-09 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 352: yeas 31, nays 17
2012-03-09 Senate Rule 82(c) suspended
2012-03-09 Dissent withdrawn
2012-03-06 House advisors appointed: Frizzell, Rhoads and VanDenburgh
2012-03-06 House conferees appointed: Behning and V. Smith
2012-03-05 Senate advisors appointed: Yoder, Mrvan and Kruse
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Leising and Skinner
2012-03-05 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-03-01 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-03-01 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 318: yeas 61, nays 34
2012-02-29 Amendment 3 (Kersey), withdrawn
2012-02-29 Amendment 5 (Battles), ruled out of order
2012-02-29 Amendment 7 (Behning), prevailed; voice vote
2012-02-29 Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-27 Placed back on second reading
2012-02-27 Motion to recommit to Committee on Ways and Means (Crawford) withdrawn
2012-02-23 Amendment 2 (Behning), prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 54, nays 36
2012-02-23 Amendment 1 (VanDenburgh), failed; Roll Call 227: yeas 36, nays 55
2012-02-23 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2012-02-21 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Education
2012-01-31 Cosponsor: Rep. Frizzell
2012-01-31 House sponsor: Rep. Behning
2012-01-31 Referred to the House
2012-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 34 and nays 16
2012-01-30 Amendment 1 (Skinner), failed; voice vote
2012-01-30 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-26 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-09 Senator Yoder added as second author
2012-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2012-01-05 Authored by Senator Leising

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2012&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0296
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/IN/IN0296.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SB/SB0296.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/ES/ES0296.1.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/ES/ES0296.2.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/ES/ES0296.3.html
Texthttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/SE/SE0296.1.html
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Srollcal/0147.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Hrollcal/0227.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Hrollcal/0318.PDF.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/PDF/Srollcal/0352.PDF.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback