IN SB0293 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Animals. Provides that a military animal rather than a service animal may be buried with a deceased owner. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on agriculture and natural resources or another appropriate interim study committee the topics of: (1) federal and state law concerning service and assistance animals; and (2) the permissible uses of service and assistance animals, including emotional support animals and therapy animals, in public accommodations.
Title
Animals. Provides that a military animal rather than a service animal may be buried with a deceased owner. Urges the legislative council to assign to the interim study committee on agriculture and natural resources or another appropriate interim study committee the topics of: (1) federal and state law concerning service and assistance animals; and (2) the permissible uses of service and assistance animals, including emotional support animals and therapy animals, in public accommodations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] |
Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Bartlett) failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Bartlett) failed (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 106 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 436: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 287: yeas 94, nays 1 |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment #2 (Bartlett) failed; Roll Call 271: yeas 31, nays 62 |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment #1 (Gutwein) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Gutwein |
2017-02-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehe |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senator Crider added as third author |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as second author |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |