IN SB0293 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Cherry added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - Representative Cherry added as cosponsor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a person to receive a 100% deduction against the assessed value of certain heritage barns.
Title
Preserving heritage barns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 029301 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 029301 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Cherry added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Washburne added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 175: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Waterman. |