IN SB0293 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reclassifies a spouse, widow, or widower of a child of the transferor as a Class A transferee instead of a Class B transferee. Reclassifies a spouse, widow, or widower of a stepchild of the transferor as a Class A transferee instead of a Class C transferee. Increases the inheritance tax exemption amount for Class A transferees from $100,000 to $250,000 with respect to taxable transfers resulting from the deaths of individuals dying after December 31, 2011. Phases out the inheritance tax over 9 years beginning in 2013. Phases out the inheritance tax replacement amounts payable to counties over 10 years beginning with amounts payable for the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2012.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inheritance tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-20 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-13 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-12 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-10 Senators Leising, Glick and M. Young added as coauthors
2012-03-09 Senator Landske added as coauthor
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 353: yeas 48, nays 0
2012-03-09 Senate Rule 86(a) suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 406: yeas 78, nays 17
2012-03-09 Senator Delph added as coauthor
2012-03-09 Rules suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-05 House advisors appointed: Espich, Grubb and Goodin
2012-03-05 House conferees appointed: Turner and Welch
2012-03-05 Senate advisors appointed: Hershman, Randolph and Kenley
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Smith and Skinner
2012-03-05 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-02-28 Senators Kruse and Eckerty added as coauthors
2012-02-28 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-28 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 80, nays 17
2012-02-27 Representatives Bacon, Baird, Battles, Behning, Borders, Bosma, T. Brown, Burton, Cherry, Clere, Crouch, Culver, Davis, Davisson, Dermody, Dobis, Dodge, Eberhart, Ellspermann, Espich, Foley, Friend, Frizzell, R. Frye, Goodin, Gutwein, Heaton, Heuer, Hinkle, Karickhoff, Kirchhofer, Klinker, Knollman, Koch, Kubacki, L. Lawson, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lutz, Mahan, McClain, McNamara, Messmer, Morris, Neese, Noe, Pond, Reske, Rhoads, Richardson, Riecken, Saunders, M. Smith, Soliday, Speedy, Stemler, Steuerwald, Thompson, Torr, Truitt, Ubelhor, VanDenburgh, VanNatter, Wesco, Wolkins and Yarde added as cosponsors
2012-02-27 House Rule 106.1 suspended
2012-02-27 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-23 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2012-01-31 Senator Schneider added as coauthor
2012-01-31 Senator Zakas added as coauthor
2012-01-31 Cosponsors: Reps. McMillin, Grubb and Welch
2012-01-31 House sponsor: Rep. Turner
2012-01-31 Referred to the House
2012-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 50 and nays 0
2012-01-30 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-26 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-01-25 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2012-01-12 Senators Head, Miller and Holdman added as coauthors
2012-01-12 Senator Hershman added as second author
2012-01-12 Senator Hershman removed as coauthor
2012-01-05 Senator Hershman added as coauthor
2012-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2012-01-05 Authored by Senator Smith

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback