IN SB0285 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the attorney general to enter into a memorandum of understanding with an entity to provide a pseudoephedrine (PSE) tracking system that meets certain standards. Prohibits a retailer from selling, and a purchaser from purchasing, more than 3.6 grams of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine on one day, or nine grams of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine in a 30 day period. Requires a retailer to electronically transmit certain information concerning the sale of ephedrine and PSE to a statewide PSE tracking system. Specifies that the board of pharmacy shall adopt certain rules concerning a pharmacy that does not comply with PSE tracking requirements. Provides that a retailer must begin entering data into the PSE tracking system not later than 180 days after the attorney general enters into a memorandum of understanding. Requires a retailer who sells drugs containing ephedrine or pseudoephedrine to: (1) post a sign warning that it is a criminal offense for a person to purchase drugs containing more than certain quantities of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine; and (2) require the clerk who is conducting the transaction to personally advise a purchaser that it is a criminal offense for a person to purchase drugs containing more than certain quantities of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine. Provides that, upon request, the clerk who conducts the transaction shall advise the purchaser how many grams of ephedrine or pseudoephedrine are contained in the drugs being purchased. Provides that an exemption to the tracking requirement for persons who do not sell exclusively to walk in customers will now only apply to persons who do not sell to any walk in customers. Requires the state police to report to the legislative council concerning the effectiveness of PSE tracking in reducing the illicit production of methamphetamine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale and tracking of ephedrine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2010-02-02 Cosponsors: Reps. Grubb and Culver
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Welch
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: Yeas 46 and Nays 4
2010-02-01 Senator M. Young added as coauthor
2010-02-01 Amendment 2 (Taylor), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Amendment 3 (M. Young), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-21 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-19 Senator Skinner added as second author
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Yoder

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback