IN SB0278 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - First Reading: Referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the state school bus committee shall adopt rules to require that each new school bus operated by or on behalf of a school corporation bear the name of the school district on the back of the school bus. Provides that an individual who is or intends to become a school bus driver must obtain a physical examination certificate from an individual who is registered in the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration's National Registry of Certified Medical Examiners. Provides that a school corporation shall determine how a certified medical examiner who is to conduct the physical examination is chosen and who must pay for the physical examination.
Title
School buses.
Sponsors
Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Vernon Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 027801 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 027801 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative V. Smith added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Soliday added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 170: yeas 40 and nays 8 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as second author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Breaux removed as first author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as first author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Rogers removed as second author. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Breaux, Wyss. |