IN SB0277 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a dealer or seller who knows or reasonably should know that methamphetamine has been manufactured in a motor vehicle within the previous two years to disclose this fact, in writing, to a buyer, prospective buyer, lessee, or prospective lessee of the motor vehicle before the sale. Permits a dealer or seller to include a decontamination report with the written disclosure. Provides that failure to disclose gives rise to a cause of action in which the buyer may seek: (1) remediation to a certain standard; or (2) reimbursement for remediation costs. Provides that, in addition, a court may award a buyer or prospective buyer liquidated damages of not more than $10,000, and that existing tort remedies that may be available to a buyer or lessee are not eliminated or abrogated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Methamphetamine vehicle information disclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 76
2013-04-18SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-03-28SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 335: yeas 45, nays 4
2013-03-25SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-03-19HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 93, nays 4
2013-03-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-03-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2013-02-12SenateSenators Wyss, Kruse and Yoder added as coauthors
2013-02-12SenateCosponsors: Reps. Lawson, Messmer and Crouch
2013-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Speedy
2013-02-12SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 106: yeas 47 and nays 1
2013-02-11SenateAmendment 1 (Zakas), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-11SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-01-31SenateSenator Arnold added as second author
2013-01-29SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Zakas

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback