IN SB0276 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid treatment pilot program. Extends the opioid treatment pilot program until 2022. (Under current law the pilot program will expire in 2020.)
Title
Opioid treatment pilot program. Extends the opioid treatment pilot program until 2022. (Under current law the pilot program will expire in 2020.)
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Rep. Bradford Barrett [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] |
Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-05 | Senate | Public Law 222 |
2019-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-11 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 434: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Representatives Brown, T. and Porter added as cosponsors |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-29 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Barrett |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senators Bohacek, Randolph, Koch, Sandlin added as coauthors |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Young M added as second author |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Raatz |