IN SB0266 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Long acting reversible contraceptives. Requires a hospital that operates a maternity unit to ensure that a woman giving birth in the hospital has the option, if medically appropriate, of having a long acting reversible contraceptive placed after delivery and before the woman is discharged. Allows a hospital to be exempt from the requirement if the hospital has a faith based objection. Specifies that a hospital is not responsible for the costs of the contraceptive.
Title
Long acting reversible contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Vermilion |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 169: yeas 26, nays 23 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Becker) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Becker) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second author |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Breaux |