IN SB0262 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Film and media production incentives. Provides the following effective July 1, 2021: (1) Authorizes the Indiana destination development corporation (corporation) to employ a film commissioner. (2) Authorizes the corporation to establish a film and media production incentive program. Requires the corporation, in coordination with the office of management and budget, to provide a report to the interim study committee on fiscal policy concerning: (1) film and media production incentives offered in other states; and (2) a recommendation on the type of incentive that should be offered in Indiana.
Title
Film and media production incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Stutzman, Hatfield, Pierce |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Karickhoff |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 152: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senators Alting and Niemeyer added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senators Raatz, Rogers, Ford J.D., Grooms, Becker, Randolph, Taylor G added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senators Young M and Buchanan added as coauthors |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as third author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Busch |