IN SB0262 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Conference committee report for ESB 262. Reorganizes certain crimes relating to state and local administration by: (1) relocating and renumbering crimes currently codified as offenses against public administration (IC 35-44) into a new article and repealing IC 35-44; and (2) relocating certain other crimes codified in IC 4 and IC 5 into the criminal code. Repeals redundant provisions. Repeals a provision adopted in 1855 prohibiting certain governmental officers from recklessly lending more money than they are authorized to lend. Exempts from the conflict of interest statute a physician employed or contracted by a hospital. Makes the disclosure of certain confidential information a Class A infraction (under current law the disclosure of certain confidential information is a Class A misdemeanor). Makes technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IC 4 and IC 5 revision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by the Governor
2012-03-14 Signed by the President of the Senate
2012-03-13 Signed by the Speaker
2012-03-13 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2012-03-10 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
2012-03-10 Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
2012-03-10 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 362: yeas 49, nays 0
2012-03-10 Senate Rule 86((a) suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 415: yeas 90, nays 1
2012-03-09 Rules suspended
2012-03-09 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2012-03-06 House advisors appointed: McNamara, Lehman and Dvorak
2012-03-06 House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and L. Lawson
2012-03-05 Senate advisor appointed: Buck and Hume
2012-03-05 Senate conferee appointed: Bray and Taylor
2012-03-05 Senate dissented from House amendments
2012-03-05 Concurrence withdrawn
2012-02-29 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2012-02-21 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2012-02-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 93, nays 0
2012-02-20 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-02-16 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2012-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2012-01-31 Senator Steele added as third author
2012-01-31 Senator Buck added as second author
2012-01-31 Cosponsor: Rep. L. Lawson
2012-01-31 House sponsor: Rep. Steuerwald
2012-01-31 Referred to the House
2012-01-31 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 136: yeas 50 and nays 0
2012-01-26 Amendment 1 (Bray), prevailed; voice vote
2012-01-26 Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed
2012-01-24 Third reading: placed back on second reading
2012-01-23 Senator Taylor added as coauthor
2012-01-23 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2012-01-19 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-01-04 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2012-01-04 Authored by Senator Bray

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback