IN SB0262 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a physician to examine a defendant who raises an incompetency claim. Requires that a psychologist, psychiatrist, or physician appointed to examine a defendant have expertise in determining competency.
Title
Competency examination.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Bray [R] | Sen. David Long [R] | Rep. Judson McMillin [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Public Law 151 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-25 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 462: yeas 50, nays 0 | |
2011-04-19 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2011-04-18 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 547: yeas 95, nays 2 | |
2011-04-15 | Representative McMillin added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-15 | Amendment 1 (McMillin), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-04-15 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2011-02-22 | Senator Zakas added as coauthor | |
2011-02-22 | House sponsor: Rep. Koch | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment 1 (Steele), prevailed; | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Senator Taylor added as coauthor | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-18 | Senator Bray added as second author | |
2011-01-18 | Senator Steele added as first author | |
2011-01-18 | Senator Long removed as first author | |
2011-01-18 | Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Senator Long |