IN SB0255 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Senator Lanane added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Senator Lanane added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Climate and environmental justice task force. Establishes the climate and environmental justice task force (task force). Provides that the task force consists of 17 members. Requires the task force to: (1) develop a climate action plan that recommends policies the state should implement to systematically mitigate climate change, facilitate adaptation to the effects of climate change in Indiana, and simultaneously enhance statewide economic development; and (2) not later than November 1, 2022, submit the climate action plan to the executive director of the legislative services agency for distribution to the members of the general assembly and the governor. Requires the utility regulatory commission, not later than June 1, 2022, to issue a report forecasting the greenhouse gas emissions that will be produced by the power generation of Indiana's investor owned utility companies in each year from 2022 to 2050, based on the investor owned utility companies' current integrated resource plans.
Title
Climate and environmental justice task force.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] | Sen. Shelli Yoder [D] |
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Alting |