IN SB0255 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the holder of a three-way permit issued for a premises within a city market to sell beer and wine for carryout. Excludes certain establishments from the application of a provision that: (1) makes it unlawful to sell beer in this state at retail in a bottle, can, or other container, unless the bottle, can, or other container was packaged and sealed by the brewer at the brewer's bottling house contiguous or adjacent to the brewery in which the beer was produced; and (2) makes it unlawful for a person to refill a bottle or container, in whole or in part, with an alcoholic beverage or knowingly possess a bottle or container that has been refilled, in whole or in part, with an alcoholic beverage after the container of liquor has been emptied in whole or in part.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carryout of alcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-12 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-18 Effective 07/01/2011
2011-05-17 Public Law 64
2011-04-26 Signed by the Governor
2011-04-19 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-04-18 Signed by the Speaker
2011-04-14 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2011-04-12 Representative Noe added as cosponsor
2011-04-12 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2011-04-12 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 485: yeas 86, nays 8
2011-04-11 Amendment 1 (C. Brown), withdrawn
2011-04-11 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-04-07 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-03-28 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2011-02-17 Cosponsors: Reps. Sullivan and Pryor
2011-02-17 House sponsor: Rep. Speedy
2011-02-17 Referred to the House
2011-02-17 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 38 and nays 12
2011-02-15 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2011-02-14 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2011-01-27 Senator Merritt added as third author
2011-01-27 Senator Alting added as second author
2011-01-27 Senator Merritt removed as coauthor
2011-01-25 Senators Merritt and Taylor added as coauthors
2011-01-20 Senator Schneider added as first author
2011-01-20 Senator Long removed as first author
2011-01-20 Committee report: amended, reassigned to Committee on Public Policy
2011-01-06 First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2011-01-06 Authored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback