IN SB0254 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Second reading: call withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Second reading: call withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a voluntary health facility audit report is privileged and inadmissible as evidence in a civil or administrative action except in specified circumstances. States that a voluntary health facility audit report is admissible in a criminal proceeding.
Title
Voluntary audits by health facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Second reading: call withdrawn | |
2010-02-22 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-02 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2010-01-28 | Cosponsor: Rep. Lehe | |
2010-01-28 | House sponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: Yeas 48 and Nays 0 | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Miller added as second author | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Errington added as coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Mishler |