IN SB0239 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 67
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coverage for breast prostheses. Provides that a state employee health plan providing coverage for a mastectomy must also provide coverage for: (1) reconstructive surgery incident to the mastectomy, including all stages of reconstruction of the breast on which the mastectomy was performed and surgery and reconstruction of the other breast to produce symmetry; and (2) custom fabricated breast prostheses, including one additional breast prosthesis per breast affected by the mastectomy. Provides that a policy of accident and sickness insurance or health maintenance organization contract providing coverage for a mastectomy must also provide coverage for custom fabricated breast prostheses, including one additional breast prosthesis per breast affected by the mastectomy.
Title
Coverage for breast prostheses.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R] |
Rep. Rita Fleming [D] | Rep. Ann Vermilion [R] | Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 67 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 329: yeas 46, nays 3 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Representative Austin added as cosponsor |
2020-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 210: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Vermilion A added as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Carbaugh removed as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Fleming |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Mayfield |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Zay added as third author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |