IN SB0239 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Tax credit for quality child care.
Title
Tax credit for quality child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Kubacki |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 214: yeas 28 and nays 22 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |