IN SB0237 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the interim study committee on economic development. Specifies the issues to be studied by the committee. Specifies the membership of the committee. Requires the committee to issue a final report before November 1, 2010, to the legislative council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study committee on economic development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2010-02-02 Senators R. Young, Deig, Errington and Mrvan added as coauthors
2010-02-02 Senator Zakas added as coauthor
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Borror
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Welch
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 122: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-02 Senators Hume, Lanane, Lewis, Sipes, Skinner and Tallian added as coauthors
2010-02-01 Senator Head added as second author
2010-02-01 Senator Charbonneau added as third author
2010-02-01 Amendment 1 (Hershman), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-26 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2010-01-11 First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2010-01-11 Authored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback