IN SB0232 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 211
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Land banks. Authorizes a county, consolidated city, or second class city to which the unsafe building law applies to establish a municipal corporation known as a land bank to manage and improve the marketability of distressed real property in the county or city that establishes the land bank. Requires a land bank's bylaws to require the land bank board (board) to approve any conveyance of real property in an open meeting and consider any pertinent information regarding the property's value or the financial ability of a person before approving a conveyance. Allows the land bank to enter into an agreement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land banks. Authorizes a county, consolidated city, or second class city to which the unsafe building law applies to establish a municipal corporation known as a land bank to manage and improve the marketability of distressed real property in the county or city that establishes the land bank. Requires a land bank's bylaws to require the land bank board (board) to approve any conveyance of real property in an open meeting and consider any pertinent information regarding the property's value or the financial ability of a person before approving a conveyance. Allows the land bank to enter into an agreement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 211
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-02SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-02-29HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2016-02-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 260: yeas 95, nays 0
2016-02-25HouseRepresentative Clere added as cosponsor
2016-02-25HouseAmendment #1 (Riecken) motion withdrawn
2016-02-25HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2016-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-01SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2016-02-01SenateCosponsors: Representatives Wright and Austin
2016-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Price
2016-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 50, nays 0
2016-01-28SenateSenator Ford added as coauthor
2016-01-28SenateAmendment #1 (Lanane) prevailed; voice vote
2016-01-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2016-01-26SenateSenator Eckerty added as second author
2016-01-26SenateSenator Eckerty removed as coauthor
2016-01-21SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2016-01-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-14SenateSenator Eckerty added as coauthor
2016-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2016-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Lanane

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/232/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/8/f/138f73d0/SB0232.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/9/a/ed9a64a1/SB0232.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/e/6/7de66cc6/SB0232.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/5/a/685a5c65/SB0232.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/2/2/6a2291c9/SB0232.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/5/5/0b5536ec/SB0232.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/4/c/764ce360/SB0232.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/5/b/385b5f99/SB0232.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/8/f/4/38f4e3f7/SB0232.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/0/6/4006909f/SB0232.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/1/d/5e1d8036/SB0232.92.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/0/9/d709a2c8/SB0232.03.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/f/d/87fda8b0/SB0232.260.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback