IN SB0220 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Law 262
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Precinct consolidation. Establishes a small precinct committee (committee) in Lake County to determine if precincts in the county that had fewer than 600 active voters as of November 1, 2016, can be combined with one or more adjoining precincts. Requires the committee to establish a proposed plan to consolidate precincts within the county that is consistent with the standards stated in the statute and submit the proposal to the Lake County board of elections and registration (board). Requires the board to adopt a precinct establishment order implementing the committee's plan. Requires the Indiana election commission to adopt a precinct establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Precinct consolidation. Establishes a small precinct committee (committee) in Lake County to determine if precincts in the county that had fewer than 600 active voters as of November 1, 2016, can be combined with one or more adjoining precincts. Requires the committee to establish a proposed plan to consolidate precincts within the county that is consistent with the standards stated in the statute and submit the proposal to the Lake County board of elections and registration (board). Requires the board to adopt a precinct establishment order implementing the committee's plan. Requires the Indiana election commission to adopt a precinct establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Melton) failed (Y: 9 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenatePublic Law 262
2017-05-02SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-03-30SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-03-29HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2017-03-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 332: yeas 59, nays 30
2017-03-27HouseAmendment #4 (Hatfield) ruled out of order
2017-03-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-03-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2017-02-28SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-27SenateSenator Freeman added as second author
2017-02-27SenateCosponsors: Representatives Olthoff and Aylesworth
2017-02-27SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Slager
2017-02-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 38, nays 11
2017-02-23SenateAmendment #1 (Melton) failed; Roll Call 174: yeas 9, nays 40
2017-02-23SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-09SenateSenator Niemeyer added as author
2017-02-09SenateSenator Long removed as author
2017-02-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Elections
2017-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2017-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/senate/220/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/2/a/8f2a4913/SB0220.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/1/c/a91c1e84/SB0220.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/7/3/bd73912c/SB0220.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/e/3/efe385ac/SB0220.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/b/b/75bb8148/SB0220.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/3/6/9a3671d2/SB0220.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/4/9/9f49c71a/SB0220.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/a/e/29aefbe0/SB0220.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/a/1/f0a1fd97/SB0220.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/d/c/56dc9ad3/SB0220.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/9/7/5297b086/SB0220.174.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/c/2/9dc27f05/SB0220.197.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/7/6/7b762645/SB0220.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/b/f/87bf203e/SB0220.313.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/c/6/3fc688d4/SB0220.332.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback