IN SB0218 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the definition of "developmental disabilities" to conform to the federal definition. Repeals the community residential council and gives the duties of the council to the division of disability and rehabilitative services (division). Changes the following concerning the first steps program: (1) the third party payor requirements; and (2) the copayment structure and amounts; and (3) allows the division to require a copayment for only one child per family during a billing period. Requires certain reports to the division of disability and rehabilitative services advisory council. Eliminates priority criteria for formal categories for developmental disability waiver slots. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to apply for federal approval to amend a Medicaid waiver to set an emergency placement priority for certain individuals.
Title
Developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-02-22 | Cosponsors: Reps. T. Brown and Crouch | |
2011-02-22 | House sponsor: Rep. Bacon | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 36 and nays 13 | |
2011-02-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-13 | Senator Taylor added as coauthor | |
2011-01-13 | Senator Miller added as second author | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Lawson |