IN SB0217 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Public Law 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Public Law 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that if an underground storage tank consists of a single tank in which there are separate compartments, a separate annual registration fee shall be paid for each compartment within the single tank. Requires the owner of an underground storage tank to pay an annual registration fee for a calendar year if the underground storage tank is not closed before January 1 of that year. Requires the department of environmental management (instead of the department of state revenue) to collect the annual registration fee. Provides that: (1) for purposes of determining eligibility for payment of a tank owner's liability from the underground petroleum storage tank excess liability trust fund, only registration fees paid in 1991 or later shall be considered; (2) for the period preceding July 1, 2014, the payment of a single annual fee of $90 for a tank containing separate compartments shall be deemed to satisfy the annual fee requirements; and (3) IDEM is not required to pay any refunds to a tank owner that, before July 1, 2014, paid a separate registration fee for each compartment within a tank. Provides that a county surveyor planning to perform a regulated drain reconstruction or maintenance project shall request a review of the project but is not required to request an onsite field review.
Title
Underground tank fee and drainage onsite reviews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 021702 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 021701 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 021702 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Roll Call 021701 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 6 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-02-20 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2014-02-20 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 236: yeas 91 and nays 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative VanNatter added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Wolkins added sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 107: yeas 45 and nays 3 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as third author. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second author. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |